UT HB0466 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Office of the Attorney General Employment Amendments
Title
Office of the Attorney General Employment Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2023-03-03 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-24 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-24 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-24 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-24 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-23 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-23 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Government Operations Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in House Government Operations Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-14 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-02-14 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Attorney General
Government Operations (State Issues)
Labor and Employment
State Officers and Employees
Government Operations (State Issues)
Labor and Employment
State Officers and Employees
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
67 | 5 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 5 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 5 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 5 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 5 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 5 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 5 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 5 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |