UT SB0230 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Preventative Primary Care Pilot Program
Title
Preventative Primary Care Pilot Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-18 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-18 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-18 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Community Health Clinics
Department of Health
Disease Control and Prevention
Health
Health Care
Health Care Data and Informatics
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Local Health Departments
Medicaid
Medical Assistance Programs
Public Health
Department of Health
Disease Control and Prevention
Health
Health Care
Health Care Data and Informatics
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Local Health Departments
Medicaid
Medical Assistance Programs
Public Health
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2022/bills/static/SB0230.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2022/bills/sbillint/SB0230.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2022/SB0230.fn.pdf |