VA HB1072 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-14 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-14 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Mining; ownership of underground void. Broadens the existing statutory provision for ownership of the space opened underground by the removal of minerals and coal. The ownership of the space would, unless expressly reserved by the landowner, run with the mineral estate whether such estate is owned or leased, or created before or after 1981. Currently, the presumption lies only with regards to mineral estates owned after 1981. The provision has no effect on the determination of ownership rights in coalbed methane.
Title
Mining; ownership of underground void.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-14 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-29 | House: Rereferred to Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-29 | House: Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to | |
2010-01-29 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-27 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101445D |