VA HB1171 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0794)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0794)
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; prohibited acts; grounds for suspension or revocation of license; exceptions. Removes the authority of the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board to revoke or suspend a license if an establishment has allowed noisy, lewd, or disorderly conduct upon the licensed premises. The bill clarifies that the Board may revoke or suspend a license if a licensee allows obscene literature, pictures or materials upon the licensed premises. The Board may also revoke a license if the licensee allows any striptease act or any person connected with the licensed business to appear nude or partially nude unless the licensee is operating a theatre, concert hall, art center, museum, or similar establishment that is devoted primarily to the arts or theatrical performances, when the performances are expressing matters of serious literary, artistic, scientific, or political value. For a mixed beverage licensee, the Board may revoke or suspend the license if the licensee allows entertainment of an obscene nature, stripteasing, topless entertaining, or entertainment that has employees who are not clad both above and below the waist unless the licensee is operating a theatre, concert hall, art center, museum, or similar establishment that is devoted primarily to the arts or theatrical performances, when the performances are expressing matters of serious literary, artistic, scientific, or political value.
Title
Alcoholic mixed beverages; grounds for suspension, etc. of license if obscene material upon premise.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0794) | |
2008-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 794 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-26 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-24 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1171ER) | |
2008-03-24 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Reading of conference report waived | |
2008-03-07 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 2-N) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 2-N) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Senators: Petersen, Wagner, Stuart | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2008-03-06 | House: Delegates: Cosgrove, Suit, Bowling | |
2008-03-06 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2008-03-06 | House: House acceded to request | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-06 | House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (1-Y 89-N) | |
2008-03-06 | House: Senate substitute rejected by House (1-Y 89-N) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB1171S1 | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Marsh agreed to 085714265-S1 | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Committee amendment #4 rejected | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Committee amendment #4 reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Amendments #2 set by Senator Ticer rejected | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Amendments #2 set by Senator Ticer reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 085714265-S1 (Marsh) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Motion to rerefer to committee rejected | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Amendments set #2 by Senator Ticer agreed to | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Amendments set #1 by Senator Ticer withdrawn | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Committee amendment #4 agreed to | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Committee amendments #'s 1, 2 and 3 rejected | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Committee amendments reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (13-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1171H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 081871472-H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Committee substitute printed 081871472-H1 | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081812806 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1171 |