VA HB1374 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0457)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0457)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plates; disabled veterans. Permits all veterans who are receiving ongoing disability pensions to be issued disabled veteran license plates.
Title
License plates, special; issuance for veterans who have a service-connected disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0457) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 457 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1374ER) |
2015-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1374H1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15103940D-H1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 15103940D-H1 |
2015-01-29 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2014-12-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-12-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100237D |