VA HB144 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0716)
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0716)
Summary
Overweight coal trucks. Provides that overweight coal truck permits are valid only for a distance of 85 miles within Virginia from the preparation plant, loading dock, or railroad.
Title
Coal trucks, overweight; permit not valid for distance more than 85 miles from railroad, etc.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0716) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 716 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB144ER) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (92-Y 4-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (92-Y 4-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-11 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-11 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (82-Y 15-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read third time and passed House (82-Y 15-N) | |
2008-02-08 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-05 | House: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 4-N) | |
2008-01-14 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: 2 | |
2007-12-21 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2007-12-21 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088365588 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB144 |