VA HB1509 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0063)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0063)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil action; failed electronic funds transfer; unlawful detainer remedies. Provides that if an electronic funds transfer is rejected because of insufficient funds or because a stop-payment order was placed on such payment in bad faith, the payee of the electronic funds transfer may recover in a civil action in the same manner as an action to recover for a bad check. The bill also provides that a writ of possession in an unlawful detainer action may be requested by the plaintiff's attorney or agent in addition to the plaintiff, and that such attorney or agent may also present into evidence an affidavit with copies of documents showing the plaintiff's right to possession of the premises. The bill further provides that such affidavit may contain a list of outstanding rent, late charges, attorney fees, and other damages owed to the plaintiff, and the court shall enter a judgment for the amount listed when entering an order of possession if the court finds that such amount is accurate.
Title
Failed electronic payments; civil action, unlawful detainer remedies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0063) | |
2013-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 63 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1509ER) |
2013-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 1-N) |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1509H1 |
2013-01-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104055D-H1 |
2013-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104055D-H1 |
2013-01-23 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil |
2013-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102625D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 1 | 626.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 126 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 27.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 27.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 471 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |