VA HB172 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0819)
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0819)
Summary
Civil procedure; disclosure of insurance liability limits. Allows an injured person, or his attorney, to request the disclosure of the liability limits of an insurance policy prior to filing a civil action for personal injuries resulting from a motor vehicle accident. The party requesting this information shall provide the insurer with (i) the date of the accident, (ii) the name and last-known address of the alleged tortfeasor, (iii) a copy of the accident report, if any, (iv) the claim number, if available, and (v) the injured person's medical records, medical bills, and wage-loss determination. The insurer only has to disclose the liability limits if the amount of the injured person's medical bills and wage losses equals or exceeds $12,500. The bill also provides that disclosure of a policy's limits shall not constitute an admission that the alleged injury is subject to the policy.
Title
Insurance liability; disclosure of limits prior to filing a lawsuit.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0819) | |
2008-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 819 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB172ER) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (65-Y 33-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 089590588-S1 (65-Y 33-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB172S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 089590588-S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 089590588-S1 | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (55-Y 43-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House (55-Y 43-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB172H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 081494588-H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Committee substitute printed 081494588-H1 | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 3-N) | |
2008-01-10 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2007-12-26 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2007-12-26 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084666588 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB172 |