VA HB191 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0391)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0391)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Expert witness testimony; chiropractor; physician assistant. Allows a properly qualified physician assistant to testify as an expert witness in a court of law on certain matters within the scope of his activities as authorized under Virginia law, except in any medical malpractice action for or against (i) a defendant doctor of medicine or osteopathic medicine regarding standard of care or (ii) a defendant health care provider regarding causation. The bill also adds "treatment" and "treatment plan" to those matters about which a chiropractor may testify as an expert witness.
Title
Physician assistant; expert witness testimony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 6-N) (Y: 95 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0391) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 391 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB191ER) |
2014-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 6-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (93-Y 6-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB191H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104474D-H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104474D-H1 |
2014-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2013-12-23 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-12-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101777D |
Same As/Similar To
SB185 (Same As) 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0361)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 01 | 401.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 401.2:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |