VA HB1923 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Transfer of firearms; penalty. Requires a background check for any firearm transfer and requires the Department of State Police to establish a process for transferors to obtain such a check from licensed firearms dealers. A transferor who fails to obtain a required background check and sells a firearm to another person is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill exempts transfers between immediate family members, transfers that occur by operation of law, and transfers by the executor or administrator of an estate or by the trustee of a testamentary trust.
Title
Firearm transfers; criminal history record information checks, penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #1 |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101423D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1923 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1923+hil |