VA HB2075 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0660)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0660)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Private capital lending for local governments. Allows a local government to enter into certain conduit lending agreements to finance certain capital projects.
Title
Local governments; private capital lending.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0660) | |
2011-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 660 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-25 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2075ER) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-04 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read third time and passed House (96-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-03 | House: Printed as engrossed 11103670D-E | |
2011-02-03 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB2075E | |
2011-02-03 | House: Amendment by Delegate Athey agreed to | |
2011-02-03 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-02 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-01 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-01 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-02-01 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-31 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-28 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-19 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103670D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1352 (Same As) 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0562)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1815 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1816 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1817 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |