VA HB2075 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - Stricken from docket by Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - Stricken from docket by Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Renewable energy portfolio standard program; solar renewable energy certificate registration system. Requires the State Corporation Commission to establish and maintain a registry for solar renewable energy certificates (SRECs). The SREC registry shall include pertinent information regarding all available SRECs and SREC transactions among electric suppliers in the Commonwealth, including (i) the creation and application of SRECs, (ii) the number of SRECs sold or transferred, and (iii) the price paid for the sale or transfer of SRECs.
Title
Electric utility regulation; solar renewable energy certificate registration system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | House | Stricken from docket by Commerce and Labor by voice vote |
2015-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100966D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB2075 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2075+hil |