VA HB2075 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2075
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
U.S. Route 1; "Emancipation Highway." Renames any section of U.S. Route 1 in Virginia that is designated as "Jefferson Davis Highway" to "Emancipation Highway." The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022. U.S. Route 1; "Emancipation Highway." Renames any section of U.S. Route 1 in Virginia that is designated as "Jefferson Davis Highway" to "Emancipation Highway." The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022.
Title
Jefferson Davis Highway; renames any section of U.S. Route 1 to "Emancipation Highway."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (70-Y 28-N) (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (70-Y 28-N) (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416) | |
2021-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 416 (effective 1/1/22) | |
2021-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2075ER) |
2021-03-09 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (70-Y 28-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (70-Y 28-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Printed as engrossed 21102542D-E |
2021-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2075E |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-29 | House | Reported from Appropriations (15-Y 5-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-26 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (14-Y 6-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-17 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102542D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2075 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)