VA HB209 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0393)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0393)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Preliminary subdivision plats. Provides that localities may mandate the submission of preliminary subdivision plats for tentative approval only for plats involving more than 50 lots.
Title
Subdivision plats; localities may mandate submission of preliminary plats for tentative approval.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0393) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 393 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB209ER) |
2014-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-31 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-09 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: #2 |
2013-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2013-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101774D |