VA HB2120 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0413)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0413)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Admission to bail; strangulation. Adds strangulation where the alleged victim is a family or household member to the list of crimes charged for which there is a rebuttable presumption against admission to bail.
Title
Strangulation; admission to bail, alleged victim is a family or household member.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0413) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 413 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2120ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (37-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (12-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2120H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104686D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104686D-H1 |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102302D |