VA HB2140 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0637)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

School calendar; opening of the school year; Planning District 16. Authorizes the school board of any school division located in Planning District 16 that was not granted a good cause waiver for the 2018-2019 school year but would qualify for such a waiver under the law as it was in effect prior to July 1, 2019, for the 2019-2020 school year to set the school calendar so that the first day students are required to attend is earlier than Labor Day, including earlier than 14 days before Labor Day. Additionally, the bill authorizes the school board of any school division located in Planning District 16 that is entirely surrounded by two school divisions that either were granted a waiver pursuant to Chapter 3 of the Acts of Assembly of 2012, Special Session I, or would qualify for a good cause waiver pursuant to ?§22.1-79.1 as it was in effect prior to July 1, 2019, for the 2019-2020 school year to open schools on the same opening date as either such surrounding school division.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School calendar; opening of the school year, good cause waiver.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (84-Y 8-N) (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N) (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0637)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 637 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2140ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-22HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (84-Y 8-N)
2019-02-22HouseConference report agreed to by House (84-Y 8-N)
2019-02-22SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (32-Y 8-N)
2019-02-22 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-22HouseConference substitute printed 19107578D-H1
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Carrico, Howell, Newman
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Thomas, Robinson, Hurst
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-21SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N)
2019-02-20HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 19106720D-S1 (0-Y 100-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed by for the day
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate with substitute (36-Y 4-N)
2019-02-18SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2140S1
2019-02-18SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106720D-S1
2019-02-18SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106720D-S1
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
2019-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-01HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N)
2019-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House (92-Y 4-N)
2019-01-31HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-30HouseRead first time
2019-01-28HouseReported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102568D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22179.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2140
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2140+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2140S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2140H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2140ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0637+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0902V0019+HB2140
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0059+HB2140
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2126+HB2140
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0300+HB2140
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2140+HB2140
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0762HB2140+HB2140
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3161+HB2140
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0924HB2140+HB2140
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1040HB2140+HB2140
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3292+HB2140

Bill Comments

feedback