VA HB221 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Students admitted to certain children's residential facilities. Requires each student admitted under a physician's order, due to medical necessity and not solely for school purposes, to a children's residential facility licensed by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to immediately be enrolled in an education program that is comparable to that which is provided in the child's school division of residence. The bill requires the school division of residence to (i) transfer on a monthly basis to each children's residential facility funds necessary to cover the expenses of providing a comparable education program for each student, (ii) help facilitate the discharge of each such student, and (iii) upon discharge, facilitate the reenrollment of each student in the appropriate school in the school division.
Title
Students; admission to certain children's residential facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2014-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2014-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104560D-H1 |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2013-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102497D |