VA HB2389 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Housing Trust Fund; revenue deposits; recordation tax. Provides that 20% of annual recordation tax revenue in excess of $325 million shall be deposited into the Virginia Housing Trust Fund.
Title
Virginia Housing Trust Fund; revenue deposits from recordation tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Finance |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102529D |