VA HB246 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 29 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0047)
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 29 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0047)
Summary
Department of Education; best practices database. Requires the Department of Education to develop a database of local school divisions' best practices regarding nutrition and physical education, including results of wellness-related fitness assessments. The database shall be accessible to all local school divisions and the Department of Health, and no school division shall be required to submit information to the database. This bill is identical to
Title
Nutrition and physical activity best practices database; Department of Education to develop.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0047) | |
2008-02-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 47 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-20 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-19 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB246ER) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-17 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-17 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-17 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | House: Printed as engrossed 084010664-E | |
2008-01-16 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB246E | |
2008-01-16 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-01-16 | House: Read second time | |
2008-01-15 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-14 | House: Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2007-12-28 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2007-12-28 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084010664 |
Same As/Similar To
SB61 (Same As) 2010-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0190)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB246 |