VA HB2462 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
School boards; school meal policies; student debt; parental notification. Requires each local school board to require the appropriate school board employee to inform the parent of any student who incurs a school meal debt of (i) the amount of such debt no later than 20 days after it accrues and (ii) the consequences of such debt and the school board policy and procedure relating to such debt, including any requirement that such student be served an alternative meal or be required to dispose of meals served to him while such debt remains unpaid.
Title
School boards; school meal policies, student debt, parental notification.
Sponsors
Sen. Danica Roem [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Chris Hurst [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Michael Mullin [D] |
Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Debra Rodman [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Education |
2019-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103055D |