VA HB377 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Zoning; traffic impact statements. Prohibits a locality from requiring a local traffic impact statement as a condition for approval of a rezoning application that involves a multifamily residential use of fewer than 50 residential units.
Title
Zoning; traffic impact statements.
Sponsors
Del. David Owen [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2024-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103317D |