VA HB400 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0095)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0095)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fostering Futures program. Establishes the Fostering Futures program to provide services and support to individuals between the ages of 18 and 21 who were in foster care as a minor and are transitioning to full adulthood and self-sufficiency.
Title
Fostering Futures program; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0095) | |
2020-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 95 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 3, 2020 | |
2020-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB400ER) |
2020-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 20100616D-E |
2020-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB400E |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Social Services |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2020-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100616D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 228 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 241 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 283.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 917 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 923 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 151 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |