VA HB401 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0775)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0775)
Summary
Emergency custody; who may accept custody. Allows the law-enforcement agency transporting a person to a facility or location pursuant to an emergency custody order to transfer custody of the person to the facility or location if the facility or location (i) is licensed to provide the level of security necessary to protect the person and others from harm, (ii) is actually capable of providing this level of security, and (iii) has entered into an agreement with the law-enforcement agency setting forth the terms and conditions under which it will accept a transfer of custody. The facility or location may not require the law-enforcement agency to pay any fees or costs for the transfer of custody. This bill is identical to
Title
Emergency custody; who may accept custody.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0775) | |
2008-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 775 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-06 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-06 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB401ER) | |
2008-03-06 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Special on Proposed Mental Health Legislation | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Rereferred to Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-25 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-25 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-24 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB401H1 | |
2008-01-24 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 088565528-H1 | |
2008-01-24 | House: Read second time | |
2008-01-23 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-22 | House: Committee substitute printed 088565528-H1 | |
2008-01-22 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2008-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080220528 |
Same As/Similar To
SB81 (Same As) 2010-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0653)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB401 |