VA HB407 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0665)
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0665)
Summary
Freedom of Information Act (FOIA); exemptions for certain fundraising strategies and donor records of public institutions of higher education. Exempts records maintained by a public institution of higher education in connection with fundraising activities conducted by or for such institution to the extent that such records reveal (i) personal fundraising strategies relating to identifiable donors or prospective donors or (ii) wealth assessments; estate, financial, or tax planning information; health-related information; employment, familial, or marital status information; electronic mail addresses, facsimile or telephone numbers; birth dates or social security numbers of identifiable donors or prospective donors.
Title
Freedom of Information Act; exemptions for certain records of public institutions of higher ed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0665) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 665 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-06 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-06 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB407ER) | |
2008-03-06 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Assigned GL&T sub: Subcommittee #1 (FOIA) | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-08 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-08 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N) | |
2008-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House (92-Y 6-N) | |
2008-02-07 | House: Printed as engrossed 084508668-E | |
2008-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB407E | |
2008-02-07 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-05 | House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (18-Y 3-N) | |
2008-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: FOIA | |
2008-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084508668 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB407 |