VA HB445 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0720)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0720)
Summary
Occupancy limits. Provides that no fines shall accrue against the owner or managing agent of a single-family residential dwelling unit for the violation of a zoning ordinance regulating occupancy limits during the pendency of any legal action commenced by such owner or managing agent against a tenant to eliminate an overcrowding condition.
Title
Single-family dwellings; fines for zoning violations related to overcrowding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0720) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 720 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB445ER) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 080916708-S1 (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Passed by temporarily | |
2008-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB445S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 080916708-S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee amendment rejected | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee amendment reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 080916708-S1 | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Rereferred to Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Motion to reconsider passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (12-Y 2-N 1-A) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Printed as engrossed 087045708-E | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB445E | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-22 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2008-01-22 | House: Referred from Rules by voice vote | |
2008-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087045708 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB445 |