VA HB585 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0408)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0408)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Competency of criminal defendant; reports for restoration providers. Requires the defendant's attorney to make available to the director of the community services board, behavioral health authority, or inpatient facility charged with treating the defendant the psychiatric record and other information that have been deemed relevant and submitted by the defendant's attorney to the evaluator. Current law requires that the evaluator's competency report be made available to the treating entity, but there is no time limit. The bill requires that all of these records and reports be made available to the treating entity within 96 hours of the issuance of the court order requiring treatment to restore competency.
Title
Criminal defendant; competency reports for restoration providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0408) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 408 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB585ER) |
2014-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 2-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-09 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101196D |
Same As/Similar To
SB541 (Same As) 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0373)