VA HB683 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0412)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0412)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Investigation of alleged child abuse and neglect; agreements with school divisions. Requires local departments of social services and local school divisions to develop written interagency agreements for the investigation of all complaints of child abuse or neglect. Currently, local departments and local school divisions must enter into written interagency agreements for investigation of complaints of child abuse and neglect involving school personnel only.
Title
Investigation of alleged child abuse and neglect; agreements with school divisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0412) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 412 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB683ER) |
2014-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-27 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-31 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Printed as engrossed 14102932D-E |
2014-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB683E |
2014-01-30 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-28 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-09 | House | Assigned HWI sub: # 2 |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102932D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1204 (Similar To) 2014-01-28 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Education
Minors
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Welfare (Social Services)
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Education
Minors
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Welfare (Social Services)