VA HB737 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Neighborhood Assistance tax credits; percentage increase. Increases the percentage of persons served by a neighborhood organization and who are low-income, as defined in § 58.1-439.18, from 40% to 50%, for purposes of applying to the Department of Social Services for an allocation of neighborhood assistance tax credits for use by business firms making donations to the neighborhood organization.
Title
Neighborhood assistance tax credits; increases percentage of persons served by organization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 416 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB737ER) |
2014-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-20 | House | Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-13 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103124D |