VA HB782 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Enacted, Chapter 819 (effective 7/1/24)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Enacted, Chapter 819 (effective 7/1/24)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Human Rights Act; dual-filed civil actions. Clarifies timelines for dual-filing complaints alleging unlawful discrimination under the Virginia Human Rights Act and the U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. The bill allows either the complainant or the respondent for any charge of discrimination to request a notice of the right to file a civil action after the Commission has closed its file on such charge of discrimination. Virginia Human Rights Act; dual-filed civil actions. Clarifies timelines for dual-filing complaints alleging unlawful discrimination under the Virginia Human Rights Act and the U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. The bill allows either the complainant or the respondent for any charge of discrimination to request a notice of the right to file a civil action after the Commission has closed its file on such charge of discrimination.
Title
Virginia Human Rights Act; complaint or charge of discrimination, right to file civil action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (90-Y 5-N) (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (90-Y 5-N) (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Enacted, Chapter 819 (effective 7/1/24) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB782ER2) |
2024-04-17 | House | Reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-17 | House | BLOCK VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-17 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-08 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB782ER) |
2024-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-28 | House | VOTE: Adoption (90-Y 5-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (90-Y 5-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Printed as engrossed 24102623D-E |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB782E |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102623D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1329 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 3905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3907 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3908 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |