VA HB799 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Property Disclosure Act; change in circumstances. Removes from the requirement that, at or before settlement, the owner be required to disclose to the purchaser any material change in the disclosures made relative to the property the option that the owner may certify to the purchaser at settlement that the disclosures already made are substantially the same.
Title
Virginia Residential Property Disclosure Act; change in circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 24-N) (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 24-N) (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 386 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB799ER) |
2014-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-23 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 24-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House (73-Y 24-N) |
2014-01-22 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-21 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-16 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101717D |