VA HB949 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0822)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0822)
Summary
Slayer statute. Amends the definition of "slayer" to include a person who is convicted of voluntary manslaughter. The bill also amends the definition of "slayer" to include a person who is acquitted of murder or voluntary manslaughter, but who is determined, by a preponderance of the evidence, either before or after his death, by a court to have committed murder or voluntary manslaughter. The bill also provides that transferees or assignees claiming through a slayer cannot acquire property or benefits as a result of the slaying. The bill also provides that insurance companies are not liable on life insurance policies acquired by the slayer for the decedent if (i) the policy was procured by the slayer as part of the plan to murder the decedent, and (ii) the decedent's death from the slayer's act was within two years of the date the policy was issued. The bill also provides that the slayer statute does not serve to abrogate any common law right or remedy that prevents a slayer from profiting from his crime. The bill also makes several clarifying amendments to the slayer statute. This bill is identical to
Title
Slayer statute; insurance company not liable for policies acquired by slayer of decedent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0822) | |
2008-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 822 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-26 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-24 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB949ER) | |
2008-03-24 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Reading of conference report waived | |
2008-03-08 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) | |
2008-03-08 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-03-07 | House: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by House | |
2008-03-07 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Conference substitute printed 089620560-H1 | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Senators: Petersen, Deeds, Cuccinelli | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2008-03-04 | House: Delegates: Iaquinto, Gilbert, Toscano | |
2008-03-04 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2008-03-04 | House: House acceded to request | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-27 | House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Senate substitute rejected by House (0-Y 97-N) | |
2008-02-26 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB949S1 | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 080293560-S1 | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 080293560-S1 | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-07 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-07 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-07 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-06 | House: Printed as engrossed 087072440-E | |
2008-02-06 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB949E | |
2008-02-06 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-06 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-05 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-01 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087072440 |
Same As/Similar To
SB450 (Same As) 2010-02-08 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (8-Y 6-N 1-A)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB949 |