VA HB955 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0731)
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0731)
Summary
Public-Private Education Facilities and Infrastructure Act of 2002; technology projects; gain sharing. Adds to the categories of “qualifying project” under the Public-Private Education Facilities and Infrastructure Act of 2002 (PPEA) any services designed to increase productivity or efficiency through the direct or indirect use of technology. The bill also adds technology applications to the types of technology infrastructure projects that may be carried out under the PPEA. This bill is identical to Senate Bill 352.
Title
Public-Private Education Facilities & Infrastructure Act of 2002; definition of qualifying projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0731) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 731 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-06 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-06 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB955ER) | |
2008-03-06 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Rereferred to General Laws and Technology | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor by voice vote | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-01 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-01 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-01 | House: Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-31 | House: Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB955H2 | |
2008-01-31 | House: Substitute by Delegate Nixon agreed to 082405656-H2 | |
2008-01-31 | House: Floor substitute printed 082405656-H2 (Nixon) | |
2008-01-31 | House: Committee substitute rejected 082393656-H1 | |
2008-01-31 | House: Read second time | |
2008-01-30 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-29 | House: Committee substitute printed 082393656-H1 | |
2008-01-29 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: FOIA | |
2008-01-15 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-01-15 | House: Referred from Commerce and Labor by voice vote | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 082369826 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB955 |