VA HB957 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0428)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0428)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation commission membership. Delays the effective date of House Bill 2152 (2013) to July 1, 2015. House Bill 2152 gives the Chairman of the Commonwealth Transportation Board or his designee equal voting weight on the Virginia Railway Express oversight board. House Bill 2152 also provides that the Chairman of the Commonwealth Transportation Board or his designee shall be included for purposes of constituting a quorum on certain transportation commissions and shall have voting rights equal to those of the appointees of component governments.
Title
Transportation commission membership; extends effective date of provisions to July 1, 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0428) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 428 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB957ER) |
2014-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB957H1 |
2014-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104373D-H1 |
2014-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104373D-H1 |
2014-02-04 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102370D |