VA HJR592 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Education; revisions to the Board of Education's "Guidelines for Uniform Performance Standards and Evaluation Criteria for Teachers"; report. Requests the Department of Education to study the need for revisions to the Board of Education's "Guidelines for Uniform Performance Standards and Evaluation Criteria for Teachers" in light of recent changes to relevant federal law and input solicited from various stakeholders.
Title
Guidelines for Uniform Performance Standards and Evaluation Criteria for Teachers; DOE to study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Rules |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-11-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-11-29 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101434D |