VA HJR622 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; diversion programs for certain drug offenders; report. Establishes a joint subcommittee to study alternative sentencing for possession of certain drugs.
Title
Drug offenders, certain; diversion programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Rules |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103101D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HJ622 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HJ622+hil |