VA SB1027 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Voting; overvoted ballots. Provides, in the case of ballots that are inserted into an electronic counting device, that if a ballot is found to have voted for a greater number of names for one office than the number of persons required to fill the office, the ballot shall be considered void only for that office and the votes for other offices on the ballot are to be counted. In the case of an electronic counting device, an election official is authorized to cause the device to receive the ballot. Paper ballots already are handled in this manner.
Title
Voting; handling of overvoted ballots, counting device to receive and count certain ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469) | |
2013-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 469 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1027ER) |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 13101743D-E |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1027E |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101743D |