VA SB1377 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0362)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0362)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Registrar of Regulations. Directs the Division of Legislative Services to employ a Registrar of Regulations for the purpose of performing the duties of the Virginia Register Act (?§2.2-4100 et seq.). Current law directs the Code Commission to appoint the Registrar. The bill reflects current practice with respect to the Registrar of Regulations. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Code Commission.
Title
Registrar of Regulations; Division of Legislative Services to employ.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0362) | |
2019-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 362 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1377ER) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100483D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 4001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |