VA SB18 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Fishery compact. Removes authorization for Virginia's membership in the Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Compact. The purpose of the Compact is to promote better utilization of the marine, shell, and anadromous fisheries of the Atlantic seaboard through the development of a joint program for the promotion and protection of such fisheries and by the prevention of the physical waste of the fisheries from any cause. If any state desires to remove itself from the Compact, it must send a six months' notice in writing to the member states of its intention to withdraw from the Compact.
Title
Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Compact; removes authorization for State's membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-30 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Continued to 2013 in Finance (14-Y 0-N) |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (9-Y 6-N) |
2011-12-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2011-12-28 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102972D |