VA SB222 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0752)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0752)
Summary
Possession of firearms by persons who committed felonies while juveniles. Provides that despite the date of his conviction, a juvenile adjudicated delinquent of certain heinous felonies shall not, when he reaches the age of 29 years, be entitled to possess a firearm. Currently, the prohibition on possession after the age of 29 exists only for juvenile felonies committed on or after July 2005.
Title
Firearms; possession by persons who committed felonies while juveniles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0752) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 752 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB222ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-29 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-02-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-11 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-10 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-07 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080314272 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB222 |