VA SB261 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Weights and measures fee. Imposes a fee of one-tenth of one cent on fuels subject to Virginia's fuels taxes with the proceeds to be used solely to test petroleum dispensing pumps.
Title
Weights and measures; moneys collected from imposition of fees shall be deposited into Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2010-03-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-03-01 | House: Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2010-02-24 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-24 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB261S1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105308D-S1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105308D-S1 | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102811D |