VA SB296 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0346)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0346)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local planning commission; action on proposed plats, site plans, and development plans; residential use. Requires local planning commissions to use the same approval process for residential development projects as is currently required for commercial development projects.
Title
Local planning commission; action on proposed plats, site plans, and development plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 2-N) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0346) | |
2024-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 346 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB296ER) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (93-Y 2-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | Passed House (93-Y 2-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2024-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-28 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) |
2024-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 2-N) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103598D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1356 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns