VA SB333 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0453)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0453)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; absentee ballots; name requirements. Provides that a voter's failure to provide his full middle name or his middle initial in the statement on the back of the ballot envelope shall not render that absentee ballot void or provide officers of election with a basis for rejection, unless the voter also failed to provide his full first and last name.
Title
Absentee ballots; requirements of voter.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (85-Y 12-N) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 7-N) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (85-Y 12-N) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 7-N) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0453) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 453 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB333ER) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Title replaced 14105192D-H1 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (85-Y 12-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Passed House with substitute (85-Y 12-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2014-02-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 7-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Passed House with substitute (87-Y 7-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB333H1 |
2014-02-25 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14105192D-H1 |
2014-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 14105192D-H1 |
2014-02-21 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2014-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2014-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2014-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 14102068D-E |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB333E |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (13-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102068D |
Same As/Similar To
HB670 (Same As) 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0575)