VA SB341 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0456)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0456)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority; chairman of the Board of Directors and Chief Executive Officer. Requires the President of Virginia Commonwealth University to serve as the chairman of the Board of Directors of the Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority. The bill also provides that in the event that the majority of the Board of Directors of the Authority and the Board of Visitors of the University disagree upon the selection, removal, or conditions of employment, including salary, of the Chief Executive Officer, each board shall appoint a committee of three members of its board to consider the matters upon which the boards disagree. If the majority voters of each committee agree upon the selection, removal, or conditions of employment of the Chief Executive Officer, the Board of Directors and the Board of Visitors will be bound by that decision. If the majority voters of each committee disagree upon the selection, removal, or conditions of employment of the Chief Executive Officer within 30 days, the President of the University shall decide the matters upon which the committees disagree, and each board will be bound by that decision.
Title
Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority; chairman of the Board of Directors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0456) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 456 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB341ER) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-24 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB341S1 |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14103690D-S1 |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14103690D-S1 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100443D |
Same As/Similar To
HB355 (Same As) 2014-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0003)