VA SB364 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0512)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0512)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local option health insurance plan. Allows the Department of Human Resource Management to develop a plan under the local option health insurance plan with benefits similar to those in the state employee health insurance plan and that uses a single rating group.
Title
Health insurance plan; Department of Human Resource Management to consider all participants.
Sponsors
Sen. Benton Chafin [R] | Sen. Jill Vogel [R] | Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0512) | |
2016-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 512 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/11/16 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB364ER) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-07 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTES (96-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2016-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-02 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-17 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB364S1 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105419D-S1 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Incorporates SB384 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105419D-S1 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102686D |
Same As/Similar To
SB384 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Incorporated by Finance