VA SB464 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; mandated coverage for autism spectrum disorder. Requires health insurers, health care subscription plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for the diagnosis of autism spectrum disorder (ASD) and for treatment of ASD in individuals from age two to six, subject to an annual maximum benefit of $35,000. This requirement does not apply to individual or small group policies, contracts, or plans, and will not apply to the state employees' health insurance plan until July 1, 2015. This measure will not apply to an insurer, corporation, or health maintenance organization if the costs associated with coverage exceed one percent of premiums charged over the experience period.
Title
Health insurance; mandated coverage for autism spectrum disorder.
Sponsors
Sen. Creigh Deeds [D] | Sen. Mark Herring [D] | Sen. Janet Howell [D] | Sen. Dave Marsden [D] |
Sen. John Petersen [D] | Sen. Richard Stuart [R] | Sen. Patricia Ticer [D] | Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Sen. Mary Whipple [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator Wagner rejected (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator Wagner reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator Wagner rejected (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator Wagner rejected (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator Wagner reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator Wagner rejected (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | House: Left in Commerce and Labor | |
2010-02-23 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-18 | House: Assigned C & L sub: #1 | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB464S1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Amendments by Senator Wagner rejected (19-Y 21-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Amendments by Senator Wagner reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Amendments by Senator Wagner rejected (19-Y 20-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105054D-S1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105054D-S1 | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 4-N) | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103458D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3418.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |