VA SB560 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Gas and oil wells. Establishes a $50 annual permit renewal fee for wells producing gas and oil.
Title
Gas and oil wells; increase annual permit fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB560S1 | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104819D-S1 | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 1-N) | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104819D-S1 | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103206D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 1 | 361.21 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 361.29 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |