VA SB566 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Passing bicycles, etc. Increases from two to three feet the minimum distance of separation which other vehicles must allow when passing bicycles, etc.
Title
Passing vehicles; any vehicle passing a bicycle, etc., shall pass at least three feet to left.
Sponsors
Sen. Creigh Deeds [D] | Sen. Dave Marsden [D] | Sen. John Miller [D] | Sen. Phillip Puckett [D] |
Sen. Patricia Ticer [D] | Sen. Mary Whipple [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | House: Left in Transportation | |
2010-02-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-02-16 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #2 | |
2010-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB566S1 | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104804D-S1 | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104804D-S1 | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103506D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 816 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 838 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 839 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 869.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |