VA SB585 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appointment of counsel for juveniles in correctional facilities. Provides that the judge of a juvenile and domestic relations district court in a jurisdiction where a state juvenile correctional facility is located shall, on motion of the attorney for the Commonwealth who has been requested to make such motion by the superintendent of the correctional facility, appoint for no more than one year, one or more attorneys to assist indigent individuals confined to such facilities with legal matters relating to their confinement. The attorney shall be paid from the criminal fund. The bill will not become effective unless funds for its implementation are included in the 2010 Appropriations Act.
Title
Juvenile correctional facilities; counsel appointed for persons confined in correctional centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-19 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2010-02-18 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-18 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-18 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10104469D-ES1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB585ES1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104469D-S1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104469D-S1 | |
2010-01-15 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102791D |