VA SB735 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0817)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0817)
Summary
Wills and decedents' estates; order in which debts of decedents to be paid. Increases from $2,000 to $3,500 the amount available from an estate to pay funeral expenses where there are insufficient assets for the satisfaction of all the demands against the estate. This bill is identical to
Title
Decedents' estates; priority of debts.
Sponsors
Sen. Ralph Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0817) | |
2008-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 817 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB735ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Reading of conference report waived | |
2008-02-29 | House: Delegates: Griffith, Kilgore, Valentine | |
2008-02-29 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Senators: Smith, Petersen, McEachin | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-26 | House: House requested conference committee | |
2008-02-26 | House: House insisted on amendment | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) | |
2008-02-20 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-02-20 | House: Passed House with amendment (96-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-02-20 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2008-02-20 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-02-20 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-19 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-15 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-15 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 084782326-E | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB735E | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (12-Y 2-N 1-A) | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 084782326 |
Same As/Similar To
HB412 (Same As) 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0666)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB735 |