VA SB773 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0769)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0769)
Summary
Prosecution of identity theft; statute of limitations. Allows prosecutions for misdemeanor identity theft to be commenced within the same limits as computer crimes. Those limits are the earlier of (i) five years after the commission of the last illegal act or (ii) one year after the existence of the illegal act and the identity of the offender are discovered.
Title
Identity theft; statute of limitations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0769) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 769 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB773ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-29 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-15 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 088920556-E | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB773E | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 088920556 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB773 |